Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Placido

Deceased

Bishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Jun 1566AppointedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
11 Aug 1566Ordained BishopBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy
20 Jan 1591DiedBishop of Sessa Aurunca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Placido
Bishop Giovanni Placido (died ) Bishop of Sessa Aurunca

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 305
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 9, Number 16
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1566, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018