Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rinaldo Cardinal Piscicello

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1415¹Born
12 May 145136.3AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
17 Dec 145641.9Elevated to Cardinal
21 Mar 145742.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
4 Jul 145742.5DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo Piscicello
Rinaldo Cardinal Piscicello (born 1415, died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for .5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1456
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1451, Number 15*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 200

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast