Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Melchiorre Pirella

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
12 May 1631AppointedBishop of Bosa, Italy
7 May 1635AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
19 Jul 1636DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Melchiorre Pirella
Bishop Melchiorre Pirella (died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118, and Page 355
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1631, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 Apr 2017