Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonçalo Pinheiro

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Aug 1537AppointedBishop of Safim, Morocco
23 Nov 1542AppointedBishop of Tanger (Tangier), Morocco
27 Jun 1552AppointedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
Nov 1567³DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary
Gonçalo Pinheiro
Bishop Gonçalo Pinheiro
(died Nov 1567)
Bishop of Viseu

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 313, and Page 335
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1537, Number 39*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 7 May 2025