Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Stefano Cardinal Pignatelli

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1578Born
11 Jan 162143.0Elevated to Cardinal
3 Mar 162143.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via
12 Aug 162345.6DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

MicroData Summary for Stefano Pignatelli
Stefano Cardinal Pignatelli (born 1578, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Via

EventPlace
Birth PlacePerugia, Italy

  • a cardinal for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 11 Jan 1621

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018