Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Pignatelli (Jr.)

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Feb 1744BornRosarno, Italy
21 Feb 179450.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
21 Feb 179450.0Elevated to Cardinal
12 Sep 179450.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria del Popolo
2 Apr 180056.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
14 Aug 181571.5DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Pignatelli (Jr.):
Cardinal Francesco Maria Pignatelli (Jr.) (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere

  • a cardinal for 21.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 21 Feb 1794

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013