Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Emiliano Pied, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Vichada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1907Born
12 Mar 193224.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
31 Jul 195649.0AppointedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia
30 Aug 196255.0DiedPrefect of Vichada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Emiliano Pied
Father Emiliano Pied S.M.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Vichada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Chapelle des Marais, Diocese of Nantes, France
Death PlaceBogota

  • a priest for 30.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1960
  • b: CB, 7 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 8 Apr 2019

Quantcast