Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine Pichot, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Saluzzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1537¹Born
8 Aug 158346.6AppointedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
11 Dec 158346.9Ordained BishopBishop of Saluzzo, Italy
7 Jul 158750.5DiedBishop of Saluzzo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Antoine Pichot
Bishop Antoine Pichot O.S.B. (born 1537, died ) Bishop of Saluzzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontmarn, Hautes-Alpes, France
Death PlaceSaluzzo, Diocese of Saluzzo

  • a bishop for 3.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 290
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1583, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast