Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Cardinal Piccolomini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Administrator of L’Aquila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1475BornSiena
1503²27.2AppointedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
1 Jul 151741.7Elevated to Cardinal
6 Jul 151741.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
11 Jun 152145.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
6 Jul 152347.7AppointedAdministrator of L’Aquila, Italy
24 Jul 152448.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
14 Nov 152449.1AppointedAdministrator of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
3 Jul 152549.7ResignedAdministrator of L’Aquila, Italy
7 Apr 152953.5ResignedArchbishop of Siena, Italy
20 Mar 153155.4ResignedAdministrator of Umbriatico (Umbriaticum), Italy
22 Sep 153156.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
1532²56.2AppointedAdministrator of L’Aquila, Italy
26 Sep 153358.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
26 Feb 153559.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
21 Nov 153762.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Siena, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Piccolomini:
Cardinal Giovanni Piccolomini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Siena

  • a cardinal for 20.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Jul 1517
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 113, and Page 297

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013