Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giacomo Cardinal Piccolomini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Priest of San Marco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1795BornSiena, Italy
22 Jul 184449.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
24 Nov 184550.3Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 184550.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
4 Oct 184752.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Marco
17 Aug 186166.0DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Piccolomini:
Cardinal Giacomo Piccolomini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 17.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013