Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Maria Pianetti

Deceased

Bishop of Larino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1648BornIesi
6 Apr 170657.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Apr 170657.6Ordained PriestPriest
17 May 170657.7AppointedBishop of Larino, Italy
25 May 170657.7Ordained BishopBishop of Larino, Italy
2 Aug 172576.9DiedBishop of Larino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Maria Pianetti:
Bishop Carlo Maria Pianetti (born , died ) Bishop of Larino

  • a priest for 19.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 237
  • ob: CB, 28 Jul 2013
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,816
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1706, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 20 Jun 2015