Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Louis Phélypeaux d’Herbault

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1719¹BornOrléans
15 Aug 175738.6SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
26 Sep 175738.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
20 Nov 175738.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bourges, France
23 Sep 178768.7DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Georges-Louis Phélypeaux d’Herbault:
Archbishop Georges-Louis Phélypeaux d’Herbault (born 1719, died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a bishop for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1757, Number 35
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 23 Nov 2015