Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Jacques-Denis Peyramale, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Coimbatore


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1844BornIbos, France
28 Oct 186925.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
23 May 190359.4AppointedBishop of Coimbatore, India
17 Aug 190359.6DiedBishop-Elect of Coimbatore, India

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Denis Peyramale:
Priest Jacques-Denis Peyramale M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Coimbatore

  • a priest for 33.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 213
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013