Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Petrucci (Petruzzi)

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Madytus


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Nov 1485AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
26 Jan 1489ResignedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
26 Jan 1489AppointedAdministrator of Teramo, Italy
26 Jan 1489AppointedTitular Archbishop of Madytus
18 Oct 1493AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Caserta, Italy
1514²DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Petrucci (Petruzzi)
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Petrucci (Petruzzi) (died 1514) Bishop of Caserta

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 155
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 246, and Page 90
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 119, and Page 183
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1485, Number 37*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast