Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luka Petrović

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Zagreb, Croatia

Titular Bishop of Calydon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1805Born
14 Sep 183428.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Sep 183428.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 186863.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zagreb, Croatia
21 Dec 186863.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Calydon
31 Dec 186863.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop-Elect of Zagreb, Croatia

MicroData Summary for Luka Petrović (VIAF: 305518115)
Father Luka Petrović (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Zagreb

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSlunj

  • a priest for 34.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 174
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Feb 2017