Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Petheö

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Pécs

Titular Bishop of Methone


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1731BornPecs
12 Jan 175523.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Mar 175523.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jul 179765.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
24 Jul 179765.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Methone
10 Sep 179765.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Methone

MicroData Summary for József Petheö
Bishop József Petheö (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pécs

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 288, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1797, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 6 Mar 2016