Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Quintinus Pessers, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1896Born
1916²19.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
11 Mar 192326.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
4 Dec 193640.1AppointedPrefect of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China
1983²86.2DiedPrefect of Xinjiang [Kiangchow], China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Quintinus Pessers
Father Quintinus Pessers O.F.M. (born , died 1983) Prefect of Xinjiang [Kiangchow]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTilburg, Diocese of ’s Hertogenbosch (Bois-le-Duc), Netherlands

  • a priest for 59.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 19 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast