Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrés Perez Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1363AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
18 Aug 1363Ordained BishopBishop of Córdoba, Spain
14 Sep 1372DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Andrés Perez Navarro:
Bishop Andrés Perez Navarro (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

  • a bishop for 9.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 209
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,004

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015