Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume de Péricard

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹Born
4 Jul 160860.5AppointedBishop of Evreux, France
31 Aug 160860.7Ordained BishopBishop of Evreux, France
15 Sep 160860.7InstalledBishop of Evreux, France
26 Nov 161365.9DiedBishop of Evreux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Guillaume de Péricard:
Bishop Guillaume de Péricard (died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,376
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 179

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013