Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonçalo Pereira

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1265¹Born
21 Aug 132257.6AppointedBishop of Lisboa, Portugal
24 Jul 132358.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Braga, Portugal
27 Feb 132661.1AppointedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
1348¹83.0DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonçalo Pereira
Archbishop Gonçalo Pereira (born 1265, died 1348) Archbishop of Braga

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 144, and Page 506
  • b: CB, 21 Feb 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 May 2019

Quantcast