Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Penny

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1505AppointedBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
31 Aug 1505Ordained BishopBishop of Bangor, Wales, Great Britain
22 Sep 1508AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
1521¹DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Penny
Bishop John Penny (died 1521) Bishop of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 15.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 129, and Page 153
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 240
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 96
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1505, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast