Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Egbert Maria Pelzer, O.P. †

Deceased

Prefect of Tingchow [Changting], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1882Born
190320.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Aug 190927.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
21 Dec 192543.4AppointedPrefect of Tingchow [Changting], China
4 May 194562.7DiedPrefect of Tingchow [Changting], China

MicroData Summary for Egbert Maria Pelzer
Father Egbert Maria Pelzer O.P. (born , died ) Prefect of Tingchow [Changting]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIsselburg, Germany

  • a priest for 35.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018