Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Arsenio Pellegrini, O.S.B.I. †

Deceased

Abbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1849Born
25 Jul 187222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ordine Basiliano Italiano di Grottaferrata
21 Jan 188232.4AppointedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy
1920²70.4DiedAbbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese), Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Arsenio Pellegrini
Abbot Arsenio Pellegrini O.S.B.I. (born , died 1920) Abbot of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata

EventPlace
Buried Place (Original)Santa Maria di Grottaferrata, Abbey, Grottaferrata, Territorial Abbey of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata (Italo-Albanese)

  • a priest for 47.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,908, Page 405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast