Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Pellegrini

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1812BornRome, Italy
28 Dec 187765.4Elevated to Cardinal
31 Dec 187765.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Aquiro
2 Nov 188775.2DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Antonio Pellegrini:
Cardinal Antonio Pellegrini (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 9.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013