Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo José Pérez de Oblitas

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1707¹Born
14 Jul 174740.5SelectedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
4 Sep 174740.6ConfirmedBishop of Paraguay (o Ssma Assunzione)
7 Apr 175649.2AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia
1760¹53.0DiedBishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra, Bolivia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardo José Pérez de Oblitas
Bishop Bernardo José Pérez de Oblitas (born 1707, died 1760) Bishop of Santa Cruz de la Sierra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArequipa

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 103, and Page 187
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1747, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018