Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giulio Pavesi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sorrento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹BornBrescia
23 Aug 155545.6AppointedBishop of San Leone, Italy
2 Oct 155545.7AppointedBishop of Vieste, Italy
20 Jul 155848.5AppointedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy
Aug 1558³48.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
15 Jun 156050.4ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Naples, Italy
11 Feb 157161.1DiedArchbishop of Sorrento, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giulio Pavesi
Archbishop Giulio Pavesi O.P. (born 1510, died ) Archbishop of Sorrento

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 332
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 279

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 16 Oct 2016