Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Paolo Cardinal Parisio

Deceased

Bishop of Nusco, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1473¹Born
Sep 1528³55.6AppointedBishop of Anglona, Italy
11 Jan 153865.0AppointedBishop of Nusco, Italy
19 Dec 153966.9Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 154067.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Balbina
11 May 154572.3DiedBishop of Nusco, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Paolo Parisio (VIAF: 89315026)
Pietro Paolo Cardinal Parisio (born 1473, died ) Bishop of Nusco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCosenza, Archdiocese of Cosenza
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria degli Angeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a cardinal for 5.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Dec 1539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 261, and Page 109
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018