Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Parchich (Parcic), O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1651³BornCattaro
2 Feb 166816.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
22 Sep 167422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
6 May 170957.4AppointedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro
May 1715³63.4DiedBishop of Kotor (Cattaro), Montenegro

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Parchich (Parcic):
Bishop Francesco Parchich (Parcic) O.P. (born , died May 1715) Bishop of Kotor (Cattaro)

  • a priest for 40.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 151
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1709, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015