Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Papa

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1627Born
26 Mar 168558.0AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
10 Jul 168760.3DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Papa
Bishop Antonio Papa (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Nicola Vallis Longe

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 255
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast