Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Paolucci

Deceased

Prefect of the Congregation of the Council

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Aug 1581³Born
9 Apr 165775.6AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council
9 Apr 165775.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Apr 165775.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
9 Jul 166179.9DiedPrefect of the Congregation of the Council

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Paolucci (VIAF: 89105691)
Francesco Cardinal Paolucci (born Aug 1581, died ) Prefect of Council

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForlì, Diocese of Forli, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Vallicella, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 4.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast