Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Pandolfi

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1751Born
1776¹24.3Ordained PriestPriest of Fano, Italy
5 Jan 181967.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Sacred Consulta
10 Mar 182371.5Elevated to Cardinal
16 May 182371.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
2 Feb 182472.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Pandolfi (VIAF: 89059852)
Luigi Cardinal Pandolfi (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCartoceto, Diocese of Fano, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Santa Sabina, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a cardinal for .8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Mar 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast