Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Benedetto Cardinal Pamphilj, O.S.Io.Hieros. †

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}

Archivist of the Vatican Secret Archives


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1653BornRome, Italy
1 Sep 168128.4Elevated to Cardinal
1 Sep 168128.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
22 Sep 168128.4InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
23 Dec 168431.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
24 Dec 168431.7Ordained PriestPriest of Sovereign Military Hospitaller Order of St John of Jerusalem
30 Apr 168532.0AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Cesareo in Palatio
30 Sep 168633.4AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
17 May 168835.1AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
22 Dec 169340.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Via Lata
1 Nov 169441.5AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
20 Apr 169946.0AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
26 Feb 170450.8AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
26 Feb 170450.8AppointedArchivist of the Vatican Secret Archives
22 Mar 173076.9DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Pamphilj:
Cardinal Benedetto Pamphilj O.S.Io.Hieros. (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a cardinal for 48.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1 Sep 1681

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013