Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Beda (Umberto) Paluzzi, O.S.B.

Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1936 Born
31 Oct 195418.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Saint Benedict
11 Jul 196125.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Apr 200973.2AppointedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy
18 Apr 201478.2ResignedAbbot of Montevergine, Italy

MicroData Summary for Beda (Umberto) Paluzzi
Abbot Beda (Umberto) Paluzzi O.S.B. (born ) Abbot Emeritus of Montevergine

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerentino

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Montevergine.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2009
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018