Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferenc Károly Palma

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Titular Bishop of Colophon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1735Born
4 Sep 176328.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Feb 176933.4ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Apr 178145.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
2 Apr 178145.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Colophon
10 Feb 178751.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Ferenc Károly Palma (VIAF: 15115567)
Bishop Ferenc Károly Palma (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosenberg

  • a priest for 23.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 174, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1781, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018