Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Rannuzio Cardinal Pallavicino

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1633Born
17 May 170673.3Elevated to Cardinal
25 Jun 170673.4InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura
30 Jun 171279.4DiedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura

MicroData Summary for Rannuzio Pallavicino
Rannuzio Cardinal Pallavicino (born 1633, died ) Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Agnese fuori le mura

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParma, Italy

  • a cardinal for 6.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 May 1706

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast