Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jacopo Palladini

Deceased

Archbishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1391AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
24 Mar 1400AppointedArchbishop of Taranto, Italy
16 Nov 1401AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Firenze, Italy
18 Jul 1410AppointedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy
1417²DiedArchbishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacopo Palladini
Archbishop Jacopo Palladini (died 1417) Archbishop of Spoleto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 473, and Page 251
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 461, and Page 347

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 2 Jun 2019

Quantcast