Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Teodoro Cardinal Paleologo di Montferrato

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1425Born
18 Sep 146742.0Elevated to Cardinal
27 Apr 146842.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro
21 Jan 148458.4DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Paleologo di Montferrato
Teodoro Cardinal Paleologo di Montferrato (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Teodoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasale Monferrato

  • a cardinal for 16.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Sep 1467

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018