Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovan Giacomo Palemonio (Palamolla)

Deceased

Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
16 Mar 1667AppointedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
20 Mar 1667Ordained BishopBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
3 May 1667InstalledBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy
19 Nov 1692DiedBishop of Martirano (Martoranum), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovan Giacomo Palemonio (Palamolla)
Bishop Giovan Giacomo Palemonio (Palamolla) (died ) Bishop of Martirano (Martoranum)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToraca
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 35
  • ob/i: CB, 13 Aug 2017
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 233, Number 19,468

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018