Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ottaviano Spinelli del Palagio

Deceased

Archbishop of Armagh, Ireland


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Jul 1478AppointedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
22 Jan 1480Ordained BishopArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland
Jun 1513³DiedArchbishop of Armagh, Ireland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ottaviano Spinelli del Palagio
Archbishop Ottaviano Spinelli del Palagio (died Jun 1513) Archbishop of Armagh

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy

  • a bishop for 33.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 95
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 118
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1479, Number 9
  • ob: CB, 31 Dec 2018
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 239, Number 20,049

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 Apr 2019

Quantcast