Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Séraphin de Pajot de Plouy

Deceased

Bishop of Die, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹Born
10 Apr 169451.2SelectedBishop of Die, France
13 Sep 169451.6ConfirmedBishop of Die, France
14 Nov 169451.8Ordained BishopBishop of Die, France
14 Nov 170158.8DiedBishop of Die, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Séraphin de Pajot de Plouy
Bishop Séraphin de Pajot de Plouy (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Die

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis

  • a bishop for 7.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 184
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast