Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Plácido Pacheco de Haro, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Plasencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1562¹BornAndalucía
20 Mar 162361.2AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
18 Jul 163371.5AppointedBishop of Plasencia, Spain
5 Oct 163977.7DiedBishop of Plasencia, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Plácido Pacheco de Haro:
Bishop Plácido Pacheco de Haro O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Plasencia

Source(s):
  • bp/bd/ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 192, and Page 282
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 145, Number 920

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015