Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eleonoro Pacello

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1643BornVicence
16 Jun 166926.4Ordained PriestPriest
7 Nov 168946.8AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
May 1695³52.3DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eleonoro Pacello:
Bishop Eleonoro Pacello (born , died May 1695) Bishop of Pula (Pola)

  • a priest for 25.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 318
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1689, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 25 Apr 2015