Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Pacheco de Córdoba

Deceased

Bishop of Córdoba


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1574AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
14 Jan 1587AppointedBishop of Córdoba, Spain
2 Oct 1590DiedBishop of Córdoba, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francisco Pacheco de Córdoba:
Bishop Francisco Pacheco de Córdoba (died ) Bishop of Córdoba

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013