Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bartolomeo Cardinal Pacca, Jr.

Deceased

Priest of the Roman Curia - Other

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1817BornBenevento, Italy
15 Mar 187558.1Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Sep 187558.6Elevated to Cardinal
23 Sep 187558.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Portico (Campitelli)
14 Oct 188063.6DiedPriest of the Roman Curia - Other

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Pacca, Jr.:
Cardinal Bartolomeo Pacca, Jr. (born , died ) Priest of Roman Curia - Other

  • a cardinal for 5.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013