Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Maria Cardinal Pandolfi Alberici

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1764Born
30 Sep 183167.5Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
2 Jul 183268.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
2 Jul 183268.2Elevated to Cardinal
3 Jun 183571.2DiedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

MicroData Summary for Francesco Maria Pandolfi Alberici
Francesco Maria Cardinal Pandolfi Alberici (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrvieto, Italy

  • a cardinal for 3.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018