Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Michael Ott, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Abbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1870Born
24 Jun 188919.2ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
29 Jun 189424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
23 Jul 191949.3SelectedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
13 Jun 192151.2ConfirmedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
192655.7ResignedAbbot of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada
15 Feb 194877.9DiedAbbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Michael Ott
Abbot Michael Ott O.S.B. (born , died ) Abbot Emeritus of Saint Peter-Muenster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNeustadt am Main, Germany

  • a priest for 53.6 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018