Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valeriano Ordóñez Villaquirán

Deceased

Bishop of Oviedo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Sep 1501AppointedBishop of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
22 Dec 1508AppointedBishop of Oviedo, Spain
12 Aug 1512DiedBishop of Oviedo, Spain

MicroData Summary for Valeriano Ordóñez Villaquirán
Bishop Valeriano Ordóñez Villaquirán (died ) Bishop of Oviedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZamora

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 19, Number 21
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 130
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 265
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,501, Number 21*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast