Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop András Ország

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Pécs

Titular Bishop of Myndus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1726³BornErsekujvar
23 Nov 174923.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Jan 175023.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Apr 177649.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary
15 Apr 177649.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Myndus
19 May 177649.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myndus
18 Feb 178861.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Pécs, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for András Ország:
Bishop András Ország (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Pécs

  • a priest for 38.0 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 299, and Page 453
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1776, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 26 Dec 2015