Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Giovanni Battista Cardinal Orsini

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1450BornRome
15 Nov 148333.8AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Domnica
15 Nov 148333.8Elevated to Cardinal
23 Mar 148939.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria Nuova
5 Nov 149040.8AppointedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy
27 Feb 149343.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo
12 Mar 149343.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 149848.7ResignedAdministrator of Taranto, Italy
22 Feb 150353.1DiedCardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Orsini:
Giovanni Battista Cardinal Orsini (died ) Cardinal-Priest of Santi Giovanni e Paolo

  • a priest for 9.9 years
  • a cardinal for 19.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Nov 1483

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015