Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Maria Orsini, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vercelli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1639³BornRivolta
17 Dec 166122.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
23 Dec 166223.0Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
24 Mar 169252.3AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
Aug 1694³54.6DiedBishop of Vercelli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giuseppe Maria Orsini:
Bishop Giovanni Giuseppe Maria Orsini C.R.L. (born , died Aug 1694) Bishop of Vercelli

  • a priest for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 410
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1692, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 27 Apr 2015